Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/17/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/17/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 05/17/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/01/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/13/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/18/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/01/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/01/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/02/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/08/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/08/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/11/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/22/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/24/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/12/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/12/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/26/1994