Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/07/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 04/07/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/07/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/18/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/18/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/18/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/18/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/18/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/24/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1993