Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/30/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/30/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/07/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/22/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/22/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/11/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/11/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/29/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/29/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/29/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/15/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/15/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/26/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/26/1993