Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/30/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/25/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/25/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/25/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/25/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/25/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/29/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/29/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/08/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/08/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/08/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/08/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/08/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/08/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/20/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/20/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/08/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/24/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/24/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew