Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/31/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/20/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/20/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/20/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 04/20/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/20/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/12/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/12/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/09/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/09/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/09/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/09/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/24/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/24/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/24/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/24/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/13/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/13/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/21/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/21/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/03/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/05/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/08/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 09/28/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/29/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 09/30/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/07/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/07/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/13/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/19/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/20/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/02/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/03/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/03/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/04/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/04/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/04/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/08/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/08/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/17/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/18/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/18/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 11/23/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/23/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 02/23/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/02/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/12/1994