Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/05/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/20/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/24/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/27/1993