Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/20/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/08/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/15/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/15/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/22/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/22/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/22/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/28/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/14/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/14/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/14/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/20/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/20/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/20/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 07/20/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/02/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/02/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/02/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/02/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 09/14/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/21/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/17/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/09/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/09/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/09/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/09/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/09/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/11/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/26/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/12/1994