Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/05/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 01/21/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/21/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/21/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/21/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 01/21/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/21/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 01/21/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/21/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/21/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/27/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/02/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 02/02/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/02/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/02/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/04/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/17/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/17/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/17/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/23/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/25/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/01/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/03/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/09/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/09/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/09/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/11/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/11/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/16/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 04/19/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/04/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/30/1993