Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/01/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/01/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/01/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/21/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/21/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 04/21/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/21/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/12/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/12/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/24/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/24/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/21/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 08/03/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/02/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/15/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/15/1994