There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Poverty Data Improvement Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

Poverty Data Improvement Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 13, United States Code, to require that the Secretary of Commerce produce and publish, at least every 2 years, current data relating to the incidence of poverty in the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/20/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. H. Rept. 103-401.
04/02/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/23/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
11/22/1993SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/21/1993-6:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/21/1993-6:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/21/1993-5:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/21/1993-5:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10576-10578)
11/21/1993-5:54pmHouseMr. Sawyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/20/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 225.
11/20/1993HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. H. Rept. 103-401.
11/10/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
11/10/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
11/04/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel
11/04/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel
07/13/1993HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel
04/20/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E960-961)
04/06/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/02/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
04/02/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/28/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/28/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/28/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/28/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/28/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 04/28/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/28/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/28/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 04/28/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/28/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/28/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/28/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/28/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/28/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/11/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/23/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/1993
Resident Commissioner Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/23/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/23/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/29/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/04/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/04/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/21/1993
Del. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/21/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/21/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/21/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/21/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/08/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 11/08/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/16/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Post Office and Civil Service04/02/1993 Referred to
11/10/1993 Markup by
11/20/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-401
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel04/06/1993 Referred to
07/13/1993 Hearings by
11/04/1993 Markup by
11/04/1993 Reported by
Senate Governmental Affairs11/23/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1645.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1645. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/21/1993)

Poverty Data Improvement Act of 1993 - Requires the Secretary of Commerce, to the extent feasible, to biennially produce and publish data relating to the incidence of poverty for each State, county, and local government (compiled from the most recent decennial census) and for each school district. Authorizes such data to be produced by means of sampling, estimation, or any other method that the Secretary determines will produce current, comprehensive, and reliable data.

Authorizes the Secretary to aggregate school districts if reliable data could not otherwise be produced for each school district, but only to the extent necessary to achieve reliability. Requires such data to be appropriately identified and accompanied by a detailed explanation as to how and why aggregation was used (including the measures taken to minimize any such aggregation).

Requires the Secretary, if unable to produce and publish such data for any area, to report to the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives on each government or school district excluded and the reasons therefor.