Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/28/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/28/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/28/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/28/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/28/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 04/28/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/28/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/28/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 04/28/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/28/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/28/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/28/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/28/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/28/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/11/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/23/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/23/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/23/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/29/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/04/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/04/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/21/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/21/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/21/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/21/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/21/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/08/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 11/08/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/16/1993