Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/17/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 06/08/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/08/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/08/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/14/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/26/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/08/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/09/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/14/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/21/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/04/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/14/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/14/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 10/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/21/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/21/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/21/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/26/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/26/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 01/25/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 01/25/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/02/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/07/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/07/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/07/1994
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/22/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/23/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/23/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/18/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/18/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/18/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/18/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 03/18/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/18/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/23/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/18/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/20/1994
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 04/20/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/17/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/23/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/24/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/09/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/09/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/14/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/14/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 06/14/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/15/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/15/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/16/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/21/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/21/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/21/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/24/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/24/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/29/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/12/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/12/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/12/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/12/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 08/02/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/02/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/02/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/02/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/05/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 08/11/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/19/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/21/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 09/21/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/21/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/22/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/22/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/22/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/26/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/27/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/27/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/03/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/03/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/07/1994