Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 04/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/29/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/29/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/29/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/04/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/04/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/12/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/12/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/20/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/20/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/20/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/20/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/20/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/26/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/10/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/10/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/10/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/10/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/10/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/10/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/10/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/03/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/16/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/16/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/16/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/22/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/22/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/20/1994