Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 04/19/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 04/19/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/16/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/06/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 08/06/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/06/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/19/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/19/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 11/23/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/23/1993