Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/27/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/27/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/27/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/27/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/27/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 07/01/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/01/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/01/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/01/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/01/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/01/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/01/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/01/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/01/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/01/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/01/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/01/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/01/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/01/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/01/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/01/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/06/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/06/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/06/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 11/19/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/19/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/19/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 11/19/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/28/1994