There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Arson Prevention Act of 1994

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Arson Prevention Act of 1993

Short Titles as Reported to House

Arson Prevention Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

Arson Prevention Act of 1993

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Arson Prevention Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program of grants to States for arson research, prevention, and control, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
05/19/1994Became Public Law No: 103-254.
05/19/1994Signed by President.
05/10/1994Presented to President.
05/06/1994Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5380)
04/26/1994Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H. Res. 413.(consideration: CR H2751-2754)
11/22/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 798 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/22/1993Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S16986)
07/26/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/13/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space and Technology. H. Rept. 103-172.
04/20/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber
05/19/1994Became Public Law No: 103-254.
05/19/1994Signed by President.
05/10/1994HousePresented to President.
05/09/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/06/1994SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5380)
05/02/1994SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
04/26/1994-1:56pmHouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H. Res. 413. (consideration: CR H2751-2754)
11/22/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/22/1993SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 798 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/22/1993SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 798.
11/22/1993SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
11/22/1993SenateSenate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S16986)
07/27/1993SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
07/26/1993-1:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/1993-1:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/26/1993-12:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/26/1993-12:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5081-5084)
07/26/1993-12:53pmHouseMr. Boucher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/13/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 96.
07/13/1993HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space and Technology. H. Rept. 103-172.
06/30/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/30/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/17/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Science
06/17/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Science
04/22/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Science.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
04/20/1993HouseHearings Held Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Science
04/20/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
04/20/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E948)
04/20/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space and Technology04/20/1993 Referred to
06/30/1993 Markup by
07/13/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-172
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Science04/22/1993 Referred to
04/20/1993 Hearings by
06/17/1993 Markup by
06/17/1993 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/27/1993 Referred to
11/22/1993 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1727. View summaries

Shown Here:
House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment (04/26/1994)

Arson Prevention Act of 1994 - Amends the Fire Prevention and Control Act of 1974 to direct the Administrator of the United States Fire Administration, acting through the Office of Fire Prevention and Arson Control, to carry out a demonstration program under which not more than ten grant awards shall be made to States or consortia of States (States) for programs relating to arson research, prevention, and control.

Directs the Administrator, in carrying out such provision, to award two-year grants on a competitive, merit basis to States for projects that promote one or more of specified goals, including: (1) improving the training by States leading to professional certification of arson investigators; (2) providing resources for the formation of arson task forces or interagency organizational arrangements involving the police and fire departments and other relevant local agencies; (3) combating fraud as a cause of arson and advancing research at the State and local levels on the significance and prevention of fraud as a motive for setting fires; (4) combating juvenile arson, drug-related arson, and domestic violence as a cause of arson; and (5) improving the capability of firefighters to identify and combat arson through expanded training programs.

Sets forth provisions regarding: (1) the structuring of applications; (2) State qualification criteria; (3) the extension of grants; (4) technical assistance; (5) consultation and cooperation with other Federal agencies; (6) assessment; and (7) the purchase of American made equipment and products by grant recipients.

(Sec. 4) Includes within a provision requiring the Administrator to provide training and instructional materials in skills and knowledge necessary to assist Federal, State, and local fire service and law enforcement personnel in arson prevention, detection, and control, a requirement that particular emphasis be placed on the needs of volunteer firefighters for improved and more widely available arson training courses.

(Sec. 5) Prohibits making certain funds available to a State or local government under the Act unless such government has a policy to actively promote the training of its firefighters in cardiopulmonary resuscitation.

(Sec. 6) Exempts Federal employee housing that does not have an adequate and reliable electrical system from the requirement for protection by hard-wired (but requires battery operated) smoke detectors.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes appropriations, including appropriations for basic research on the development of an advanced course on arson prevention and for the expansion of arson investigator training programs at the National Fire Academy and the Federal Law Enforcement Training Center or through regional delivery sites.

(Sec. 8) Prohibits any funds from being authorized to be appropriated for any fiscal year after FY 1996 for carrying out the programs for which funds are authorized by this Act or the amendments made by this Act.