Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/01/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/19/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/24/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/27/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/08/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/03/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew