Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/20/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/20/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/20/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/26/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/26/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/26/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/21/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/28/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/19/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 08/02/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/08/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/15/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/29/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/26/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/09/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 11/20/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/20/1993