Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/27/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/27/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/14/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/17/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/17/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/24/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/23/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/19/1993