Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/17/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/17/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/20/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/20/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 09/08/1993