Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/21/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/21/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/19/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/19/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/16/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/16/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/16/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/16/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/01/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/01/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/01/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/01/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/01/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/01/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/01/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/01/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 07/01/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/28/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/28/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/28/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/28/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/28/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/09/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/09/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/19/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/19/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/19/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/19/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/19/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 02/02/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 02/23/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/20/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/22/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/13/1994