Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 04/22/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/22/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/22/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 04/22/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/06/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/06/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/06/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/06/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/20/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/20/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/16/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/16/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/22/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/22/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/09/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/09/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/22/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/22/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/03/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/08/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 06/22/1994