Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/27/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/27/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/27/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/18/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/04/1994