Committees: H.R.1845 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries04/22/1993 Referred to
07/27/1993 Markup by
07/27/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-193 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources04/26/1993 Referred to
07/15/1993 Hearings by
07/22/1993 Markup by
07/22/1993 Reported by
House Natural Resources07/27/1993 Referred to
07/28/1993 Hearings by
07/28/1993 Markup by
09/09/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-193 Part 2
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands07/28/1994 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology07/27/1993 Referred to
09/10/1993 Discharged from
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Technology, Environment and Aviation08/02/1993 Referred to
09/14/1993 Hearings by
Senate Environment and Public Works11/01/1993 Referred to