Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/10/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/19/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/07/1994