Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/27/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 04/27/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/27/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/04/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/04/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/04/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/04/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/04/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/04/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/04/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/12/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/12/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/20/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/20/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/20/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/20/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/20/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/14/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/22/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/27/1993