Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/10/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 06/10/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/10/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/10/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/13/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/13/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/13/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/13/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/13/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/22/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 07/28/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/28/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/04/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/04/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/21/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/21/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/23/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/23/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/27/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 10/06/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/07/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/14/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/03/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 11/04/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/02/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/02/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/02/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/02/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/02/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/09/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/02/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 08/26/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/26/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/26/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/26/1994