Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 05/11/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 05/11/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/11/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/11/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/11/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/25/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 05/25/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/25/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/25/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/16/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/16/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/15/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 11/21/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/21/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/13/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/05/1994