Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/29/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/29/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/29/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/29/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/29/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/29/1993
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/06/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/06/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/06/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/06/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 05/06/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/06/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/06/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/06/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/06/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/06/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 05/06/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/11/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/11/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/11/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/11/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/19/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/25/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/25/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/30/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/20/1993