Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 04/28/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/28/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/18/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/18/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/18/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/18/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/18/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/18/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/14/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/14/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/14/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/14/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/14/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/14/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/14/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/14/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/14/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/14/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/14/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/14/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/14/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/14/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/14/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/14/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/18/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/18/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/18/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/22/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/22/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/13/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/23/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/23/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/23/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/23/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/23/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/23/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/23/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/23/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/23/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/23/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 07/23/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/04/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 08/04/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/04/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/04/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 09/13/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/13/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/13/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/13/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/13/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/13/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/13/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/13/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/13/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/13/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/13/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/13/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/13/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/19/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/19/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/19/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/19/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/19/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 11/19/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/19/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/11/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/21/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/10/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/10/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/25/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/25/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/25/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/25/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 06/14/1994