There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

High-Speed Rail Development Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

High-Speed Rail Development Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program to facilitate development of high-speed rail transportation in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/28/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-258.
04/29/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
09/28/1993Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 146.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-258.
07/27/1993Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/27/1993Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/27/1993Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials
05/27/1993Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials
05/05/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/29/1993Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials
04/29/1993Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/29/1993 Referred to
07/27/1993 Markup by
09/28/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-258
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials05/05/1993 Referred to
04/29/1993 Hearings by
05/27/1993 Markup by
05/27/1993 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1919. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/28/1993)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: High-Speed Rail Development

Title II: Labor Protection

High-Speed Rail Development Act of 1993 - Title I: High-Speed Rail Development - Amends the Railroad Revitalization and Regulatory Reform Act of 1976 to authorize the Governor of a State to petition the Secretary of Transportation (Secretary) for designation of a proposed corridor for high-speed rail assistance. Requires an applicant to submit a corridor master plan for the Secretary's approval.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide finance assistance for plan preparation and for funding improvements.

Authorizes the Secretary to conduct research and development of high-speed rail technologies for commercial application in high-speed service in the United States.

Requires applicants receiving high-speed rail assistance to comply with Buy American requirements.

Requires the Secretary to issue and publish in the Federal Register a list of conditions to be imposed to protect the interests of railroad employees who may be adversely affected as a result of the provision of high-speed rail assistance under this Act.

Authorizes appropriations.

Amends the Rail Passenger Service Act to decrease the authorization of appropriations for FY 1994 for capital acquisition and development for the Northeast Corridor. Authorizes appropriations for FY 1995.

Title II: Labor Protection - Amends the Railroad Revitalization and Regulatory Reform Act of 1976 to require the Secretary to ensure that all workers employed by contractors and subcontractors in the construction of high-speed rail projects be paid wages at rates not less than those prevailing on similar construction in the locality as determined in accordance with the Davis-Bacon Act. Conditions approval of financial assistance upon adequate assurance that required labor standards will be maintained on the construction work.