Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/26/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/26/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/15/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/22/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/18/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/12/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/21/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 08/11/1994