There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fisk University Historic District Restoration and Preservation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize appropriations for the restoration of historic buildings in the Fisk University Historic District.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/29/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/29/1993Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/03/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/03/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/03/1993
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/13/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/13/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/21/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/22/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/26/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 07/30/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/02/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/29/1993 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands06/15/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1923.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1923. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/29/1993)

Fisk University Historic District Restoration and Preservation Act - Authorizes appropriations to the Secretary of the Interior for the restoration of historic buildings in the Fisk University Historic District, Nashville, Tennessee.