Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/09/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/25/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/25/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/25/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/25/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/25/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/25/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/25/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/25/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/27/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/27/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/27/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/27/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/27/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/27/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/03/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/03/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/03/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/03/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/03/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/03/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 08/05/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/05/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/05/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/05/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/05/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/11/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/11/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/11/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 08/11/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/11/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 08/12/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/12/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/12/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/12/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 08/12/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/12/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 08/12/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/12/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/12/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 08/12/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 08/12/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 08/12/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 08/12/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/12/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/12/1994