Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/29/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/29/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/18/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/18/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/18/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/18/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/18/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/29/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/29/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/21/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/21/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/03/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/03/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 08/03/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/03/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/06/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/06/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 08/06/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/14/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/14/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/14/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/14/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/14/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/23/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/23/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/29/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/29/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/29/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 09/29/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/29/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/29/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/07/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/26/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/19/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/19/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/19/1993