Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/29/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/04/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 05/04/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/04/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/06/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/19/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/24/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/10/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/10/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 06/15/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/15/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/16/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/18/1993