Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/10/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/10/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 05/10/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/10/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/10/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/10/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/08/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/08/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/08/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/08/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/08/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/08/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/08/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/08/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/13/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 09/14/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/14/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/14/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/14/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/14/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/14/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/05/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/05/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/05/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/05/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 10/05/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/05/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 10/05/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 10/05/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/05/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/05/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/05/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/05/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 10/05/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 10/05/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/19/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/19/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/19/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 10/19/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/19/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/19/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/19/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 10/19/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/19/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 05/19/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/19/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/28/1994