Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/04/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 05/04/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/04/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/04/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/18/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/18/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/18/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/18/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/18/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/18/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/09/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 07/26/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/27/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 02/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/22/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/22/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/23/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/07/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/07/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/11/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/11/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/24/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/26/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/26/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/22/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/19/1994