Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/10/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/20/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/15/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/22/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/22/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/10/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/22/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/22/1994
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/01/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/07/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 03/17/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1994