Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/08/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 06/08/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/08/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/08/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/08/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/10/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/10/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/16/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/16/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/24/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 06/24/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/24/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/24/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/01/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/01/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/15/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/15/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/15/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/15/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/15/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/15/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/23/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/23/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/23/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/23/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/23/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/23/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/23/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/03/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/03/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 08/03/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/03/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/06/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/27/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/27/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/08/1994