Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/05/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/24/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/24/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/26/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/26/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/08/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/23/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/23/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/23/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/14/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/14/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/14/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/14/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/14/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/27/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/27/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/27/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/15/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/15/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/15/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/15/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/15/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 10/15/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/15/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/15/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/15/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/15/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/22/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/01/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/01/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/01/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/01/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/01/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/20/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/20/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/05/1994