Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/12/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/19/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/29/1994