Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/06/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/06/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/13/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/13/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/13/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/13/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/13/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/18/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/18/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/18/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/18/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/18/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/18/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/26/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/26/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/26/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/22/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/22/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/28/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 06/28/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/28/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/01/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 07/19/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/19/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/27/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/27/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/27/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/05/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/05/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/14/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/22/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/15/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/27/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/02/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/10/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/18/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/10/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/23/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/13/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/12/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/07/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/07/1994