Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/12/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/12/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/12/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 05/12/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/12/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/24/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/28/1993