Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/08/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/16/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/16/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/16/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/16/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/18/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/23/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/23/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/23/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/30/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/30/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/13/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/20/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/20/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/04/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/12/1994