Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/17/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/17/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/17/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/25/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/17/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/17/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/17/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/20/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/15/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/27/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/27/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/27/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 09/27/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/27/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/27/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/27/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/27/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/14/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/14/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/14/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/14/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/14/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/19/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 10/19/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/19/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/19/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/03/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 11/03/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/04/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/15/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/15/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/15/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/15/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/15/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/15/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/15/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/18/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/25/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 01/25/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/02/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/07/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/09/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/09/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/22/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/28/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/16/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/23/1994