Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/03/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/03/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/03/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/03/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 02/03/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/03/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/03/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/03/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/03/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/03/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/03/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/17/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/17/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/17/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/23/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/23/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/16/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/16/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/17/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/30/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/30/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/30/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/31/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/31/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/20/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/20/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/20/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/28/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/06/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/19/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 05/19/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/27/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/18/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/18/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/24/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/01/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/01/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/14/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/20/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 08/04/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 08/04/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/13/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/18/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/19/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/23/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/23/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/13/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/26/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/29/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/29/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/05/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/05/1994