Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/04/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/23/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/23/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/16/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/13/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/13/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/13/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/11/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/11/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/11/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/11/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/11/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/11/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/11/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/14/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/14/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/14/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/14/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/19/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/03/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/03/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/1994