Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/18/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/24/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/24/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/24/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/24/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/24/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 06/24/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/24/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/24/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/19/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 10/19/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/19/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/19/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 10/19/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/26/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/26/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 01/26/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/01/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/03/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/03/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/11/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/11/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/28/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/13/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 06/27/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 07/21/1994