Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/19/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/28/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/28/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 06/28/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/28/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/28/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/28/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/28/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/28/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/28/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/28/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/28/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/28/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/13/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/02/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/02/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/13/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/13/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/13/1993